SOUTHWARK EQUESTRIAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
teaching disabled children in the Southwark to ride and drive. Also contact with our numerous small animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Southwark
Governance
- 05 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES EDWARD ROBSON JUNIOR | Chair | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN CANTY | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA TINSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICK CANTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT HENRY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.40k | £4.20k | £19.48k | £111 | £332.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.30k | £4.90k | £2.24k | £14.58k | £38.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 June 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 July 2020 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH JUNE 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES TO ENABLE PHYSICALLY AND MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN LEISURE AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING HORSE-RIDING AND OTHER EQUESTRIAN EVENTS, THE CARE OF HORSES AND OTHER ANIMALS AND BIRDS AND BOATING AND OTHER RECREATION IN OR ON WATER IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL RECREATION OF THE SAID PERSONS AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farningham Stud
London Road
Farningham
DARTFORD
DA4 0JQ
- Phone:
- 07753375550
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window