THE WALDORF SCHOOL OF SOUTH-WEST LONDON LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of children in accordance with the theory and practice of Rudolf Steiner
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £22,348 from 9 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 17 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SUSAN PEAT | Chair | 17 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Nia Yaku Neshama | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saheed Ola Adamson | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela clark MRs | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £665.84k | £477.66k | £468.18k | £369.44k | £462.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £590.08k | £438.97k | £413.12k | £431.86k | £463.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £58.79k | £31.97k | £22.35k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £153.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £25.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £486.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £31 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £585.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 July 2024 | 375 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 July 2024 | 375 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OF ASSOCIATION MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 5TH MARCH 1984 AND AMENDED 23RD JUNE 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE TEACHINGS OF THE LATE DR RUDOLF STEINER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 HOUSTON ROAD
LONDON
SE23 2RN
- Phone:
- 02034173190
- Email:
- info@waldorf-swlondon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window