Financial history HENDON MOSQUE & ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 289834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £1.12m £1.09m £1.24m £1.38m
Total expenditure £917.92k £966.68k £916.32k £933.46k £833.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £234.63k £116.34k £250.32k £447.35k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £704.80k £918.61k £710.54k £622.56k £1.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £139.08k £83.56k £129.88k £169.34k £190.73k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £834.05k £966.68k £916.32k £933.46k £833.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.77k £5.06k £6.34k £4.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £83.87k £0 £0 £0 £0