Financial history NSUTAMAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.38k £1.26k £510 £965 £1.05k
Total expenditure £2.28k £1.22k £400 £70 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A