EASTBOURNE AND DISTRICT MIND ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We currently run 2 social groups and 1 support group. We also run a group entitled "Moody Blues" which focuses on offering training, education and support for those experiencing mental health problems, with a focus on the symptoms of depression and anxiety. On average we have around 25 people attending each week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 30 June 1984: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MIND-EASTBOURNE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.58k | £5.28k | £11.22k | £6.38k | £14.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47k | £6.74k | £9.01k | £11.16k | £11.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 13 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 13 June 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 14 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 30 August 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 19 MAY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
EASTBOURNE BOROUGH COUNCIL AND ADJACENT VILLAGES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window