COVE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 289856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational Support within the Parish of Cove

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £9,323
Total expenditure: £9,720

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gemma Foster Chair 01 April 2019
None on record
Anthony John Andrews Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
KIRSTY LOUISE PADDON Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Mrs Jane Whittington Trustee 13 June 2016
None on record
Anthony John Hawkins Trustee 18 May 2015
None on record
John Henry Marsh Trustee 04 March 2013
FARNBOROUGH (HAMPSHIRE) WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
JACQUELINE ANN SNUGGS Trustee 17 July 2012
Cove Parochial Church Council
Received: 48 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.06k £4.14k £4.25k £9.26k £9.32k
Total expenditure £3.19k £3.73k £2.68k £7.77k £9.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
120a Fleet Road
FARNBOROUGH
GU14 9RG
Phone:
01252545341
Website:

No information available