Trustees BOOKER COMMON AND WOODS PROTECTION SOCIETY
Charity number: 289871

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN TRANTER | Chair | 10 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Wayne Michael Jeves | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Blackman | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Bowden | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hedley Luxton | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Thomas McMahon | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stagg | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jay | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.