Financial history STONE-CUM-EBONY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 289895
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £1.49k £2.07k £1.84k £1.54k £1.16k
Total expenditure £1.95k £1.61k £2.08k £1.20k £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A