RICHMOND CONCERT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serious Music Concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 25 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Watts | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Pamela Mary Bowman | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mike Langley | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Thresh | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Sotiracis Alexiou | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marie Irene Leonie Renee Denivelle | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JILL WARNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET HEWITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NILDA GINN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVELYN RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.17k | £14.37k | £53.15k | £50.37k | £50.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.40k | £26.82k | £47.34k | £43.14k | £57.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH JULY 1984 AS AMENDED 8TH DECEMBER 1998 AND 1 FEBRUARY 2006 as amended on 17 Jul 2018 as amended on 22 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND DEVELOP APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY, THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE, SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 NORTHUMBERLAND AVENUE
ISLEWORTH
TW7 5HT
- Phone:
- 02085607509
- Email:
- nbginn@blueyonder.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window