LAMBETH WOMEN'S PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lambeth Women's Project (LWP), functions as an umbrella organisation and to support and facilitate a large number of diverse and often unique groups and events. As the only women-only space in the local area, we recognise the diversity of our women but believe that their needs are specific and not always met. Our organisation was created to fill this gap and to this day is unique in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
Governance
- 25 July 1984: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 February 2010: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- LWP (Working name)
- LAMBETH GIRLS' PROJECT (Previous name)
- LAMBETH YOUNG WOMEN'S PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.04k | £2.98k | £20.38k | £25.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.10k | £3.77k | £19.07k | £25.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 09 December 2011 | 312 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 14 February 2011 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 25 February 2010 | 25 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 24 February 2010 | 389 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 24 February 2010 | 389 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 1984 AS AMENDED 18 AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED AT AGM JAN 20 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH AND TO HELP TO EDUCATE THEM THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LAMBETH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window