THE FRIENDS OF JULIAN OF NORWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objectives are to advance the education of the public in the Shrine of the Lady Julian of Norwich and to advance religion by promoting and furthering the work of the Shrine of the Lady Julian of Norwich.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 August 1986: Standard registration
- THE JULIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST JULIAN'S (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Cornes | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Care | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret-Mary McFadyen | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Mitchell | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Oliver Stanton | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Sally-Anne Lomas | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD GREEN | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.42k | £22.65k | £39.18k | £24.76k | £26.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.90k | £19.75k | £48.50k | £40.56k | £46.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/05/1984 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/1992 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2001 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/2013 as amended on 11 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SHRINE OF LADY JULIAN OF NORWICH AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY PROMOTING AND FURTHERING THE WORK OF THE SHRINE OF LADY JULIAN OF NORWICH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 GOLDEN DOG LANE
NORWICH
NR3 1BP
- Phone:
- 01603 627632
- Website:
-
julianofnorwich.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window