Financial history GURDWARA NANAKSAR

Charity number: 289934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/04/2020 13/04/2021 13/04/2022 13/04/2023 13/04/2024
Total gross income £249.19k £183.33k £310.35k £340.96k £389.54k
Total expenditure £118.09k £122.25k £156.40k £225.12k £256.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A