HACKNEY AND CITY OF LONDON VICTIMS SUPPORT SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping people cope with the effects of crime. We provide information and support through our community and court based services to victims and witnesses affected by crime. Our services are free, confidential and available to everyone, whether or not the crime has been reported and regardless of when it happened.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of London
- Hackney
Governance
- 10 August 1984: Standard registration
- 18 June 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 18 June 2009: Funds transferred to 298028 VICTIM SUPPORT
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 29/02/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.46k | £167.66k | £179.37k | £179.28k | £146.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.83k | £173.79k | £184.91k | £186.48k | £133.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 07 January 2009 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | 11 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 12 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 01 February 2007 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 08 February 2007 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 09 February 2006 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 09 February 2006 | 9 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH JULY 1984
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN HACKNEY AND THE CITY OF LONDON (AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD HEREOF) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED AS A RESULT OF CRIME.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY AND THE CITY OF LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window