Accounts and annual returns THE BASINGSTOKE ENGINEERING TRAINING ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 289984
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2005 28 June 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 30 June 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 14 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 14 June 2005 On Time