Governing document THE BASINGSTOKE ENGINEERING TRAINING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity Number: 289984
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH AUGUST 1968 AS AMENDED 13TH JULY 1971 AND 26TH MARCH 1984 AND REVISED 28 JULY 1998, AMENDED 25 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS REQUISITE FOR EMPLOYMENT IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.