Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT CROYDON

Charity Number: 289985
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 25 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 29 October 2004 On Time