Financial history VICTIM SUPPORT CROYDON

Charity number: 289985
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/05/2008
Total gross income £273.40k £298.52k £310.40k £317.73k £408.00k
Total expenditure £244.54k £258.78k £294.55k £309.59k £444.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A