VICTIM SUPPORT CROYDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to victims of crime in the London Borough of Croydon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 August 1984: Standard registration
- 09 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CROYDON VICTIMS SUPPORT SCHEME (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/05/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.40k | £298.52k | £310.40k | £317.73k | £408.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.54k | £258.78k | £294.55k | £309.59k | £444.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | 27 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 27 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 26 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 26 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 25 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 29 October 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 1983 AS AMENDED 26 MAY 1987 AND 6 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED 4 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED AS A RESULT OF CRIME.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window