Financial history THE FRIENDS OF COLDHARBOUR MILL MUSEUM

Charity number: 289991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.76k £5.24k £4.30k £8.12k £5.90k
Total expenditure £9.15k £821 £6.67k £10.26k £7.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A