Financial history THE MICHAEL FLANDERS CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 290000
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2005 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £988 £336 £225 £148 £520
Total expenditure £2.80k £6.85k £1.29k £400 £292
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A