Accounts and annual returns ISLAMIC AND CULTURAL SOCIETY OF HARROW

Charity number: 290016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 January 2025 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 January 2023 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 January 2023 448 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required