THE HERSCHEL ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the study of Astronomy. Talks and events for society members. Open evenings for the public, school and community groups, etc. Visits to schools, etc to give information and guidance on observation equipment and its use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Slough
- Surrey
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 15 August 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN DAVID BRUCE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Law | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN EDWARD COLTHORPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271 | £105 | £121 | £87 | £161 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.14k | £201 | £272 | £297 | £191 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 27TH JULY 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Conway Road
Taplow
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
FAS society
SL6 0LB
- Phone:
- 01189700862
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window