Financial history BROADWAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 290068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £16.06k £8.87k £14.51k £16.77k £21.37k
Total expenditure £10.14k £11.26k £11.25k £11.29k £19.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A