HISTORY OF WAPPING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
History walks and talks. Books on local history and Christmas Cards in the area of Wapping and Shadwell, east London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 06 September 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Juliette Day | Trustee | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stella Keep | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN KENTFIELD | Trustee | 11 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DOUGLAS TARBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS NEWTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.50k | £1.03k | £1.48k | £1.22k | £1.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £457 | £253 | £505 | £1.52k | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH JULY 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF SOCIAL HISTORY IN WAPPING AND PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A LOCAL HISTORY MUSEUM WITHIN THE WAPPING AREA.
Area of benefit
WAPPING
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Turks Head
1 Green Bank
Wapping
London
E1W 2PA
- Phone:
- 02077022205
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window