RAMSEY RURAL MUSEUM COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The acquisition, restoration and exhibition to the public of rural bygones and items having a connection with social, domestic, craft, trade, industry, agriculture, rural history and social history( in Ramsey and the surrounding villages )
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 07 September 1984: Standard registration
- 19 August 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1182116 RAMSEY RURAL MUSEUM CIO
- RAMSEY RURAL MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.01k | £41.72k | £42.40k | £44.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.80k | £35.97k | £33.03k | £39.35k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.18k | £1.00k | £2.10k | £200 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 17 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 17 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 8TH MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 15TH MAY 1998
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN OR NEAR THE TOWN OF RAMSEY FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF ITEMS OF RURAL BYGONES; ITEMS HAVING A CONNECTION WITH SOCIAL, DOMESTIC, AGRICULTURAL AND RURAL HISTORY; AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENTS; SPECIMENS OF THE FINE ARTS; ETHNOLOGY: ARCHAEOLOGY: GEOLOGY: BOTANY AND NATURAL HISTORY.
Area of benefit
IN OR NEAR THE TOWN OF RAMSEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window