Accounts and annual returns FIVE BRIDGES

Charity number: 290133
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 23 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 17 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 26 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 26 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2008 01 June 2009 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 09 December 2008 On Time