Financial history FIVE BRIDGES

Charity number: 290133
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £542.64k £692.27k £733.70k £686.10k £868.25k
Total expenditure £542.81k £636.02k £742.44k £703.80k £724.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £4.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £681.45k £718.90k £675.75k £867.89k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £10.82k £14.81k £5.54k £354
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £801 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £615.36k £712.29k £673.16k £689.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £20.66k £30.15k £30.64k £34.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0