ROCKINGHAM NURSERY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ROCKINGHAM COMMUNITY DAY NURSERY FALMOUTH ROAD LONDON SE1 6RQ
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Southwark
Governance
- 06 September 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Awosika | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Scot | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Odukoya | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mongi | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernice Ago Kumadie | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adetoun Ayofe | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Selina Capgrass- Davis | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shefa Begum | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ISAAC SADIKU | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.84k | £12.10k | £185.22k | £216.18k | £222.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.59k | £11.90k | £185.87k | £216.66k | £233.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £163.90k | N/A | N/A | £198.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH AUGUST 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER FIVE LIVING ON THE ROCKINGHAM ESTATE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, RELIGIOUS, POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS: TO ASSOCIATE WITH THE INHABITANTS, THE LOCAL AND EDUCATIONAL AUTHORITIES, AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FOR PARENTS AND CHILDREN WITHIN THE BENEFIT AREA, FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
ROCKINGHAM ESTATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCKINGHAM ESTATE
COUNTY STREET
LONDON
SE1 6RQ
- Phone:
- 02074035643
- Email:
- Rcdnline1@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window