LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER AND ASSOCIATED HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Allocation of monies donated to the League of Friends by the public, to wards and departments of the Royal Devon & Exeter Hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 17 September 1984: Standard registration
- RD&E LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER HOSPITAL AND ASSOCIATION HOSPITALS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERYL HAYES | Chair | 09 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATE CALDWELL | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
F J OLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REUBEN MILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Kathleen NIKLAUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £970 | £2.56k | £3.68k | £581 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.63k | £29.61k | £26.78k | £27.58k | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27TH APRIL 1984 AS AMENDED 22 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL(S) WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM, OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL(S). TO PROVIDE OR TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FUNDING BY WAY OF BURSARY OR GRANT FOR EDUCATIONAL OR TRAINING PURPOSES OF ANY MEDICAL STAFF IN POST IN THE SAID HOSPITAL(S) OR FOR ANY STUDENT TRAINING OR STUDYING IN ANY MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL FACILITY LOCATED WITHIN THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE HOSPITAL(S)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elm Cottage
Zeal Monachorum
Crediton
EX17 6DG
- Phone:
- 01363 881298
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window