Hands Gillingham

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides services for older, disabled or vulnerable adults in the Gillingham area, including a transport service to medical appointments or other essential journeys, a basic gardening service and other services to alleviate social isolation. To do all such lawful things to further the attainment of such purposes Area of operation and benefit, Gillingham, Medway
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Medway
Governance
- 18 September 1984: Standard registration
- HANDS IN MEDWAY (Working name)
- HANDS AND GILLINGHAM VOLUNTEER BUREAU (Previous name)
- HANDS AND GILLINGHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY KEMP | Chair | 07 October 2014 |
|
|||||
WENDY IRENE BACK | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN TERRY | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE STEARN | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Joyce Kemp | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.56k | £6.22k | £6.24k | £3.50k | £15.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.97k | £11.56k | £4.07k | £4.03k | £3.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/10/1983 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/1992 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/1995 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2001 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2004 AS AMENDED ON 23/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2013 as amended on 19 Oct 2021 as amended on 04 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
The Charity’s objects (“the objects”) are To promote purposes which are charitable according to the law in England and Wales by: 1) Providing services for older, disabled or vulnerable adults in the Gillingham area, including: • a transport service to medical appointments and for other essential journeys; • a basic gardening service; • other services to alleviate social isolation. 2) Generally to do all such lawful things as will further the attainment of such purposes or any of them.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF GILLINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hands Gillingham
The Oast Community Centre
Granary Close
Rainham
Gillingham
ME9 7SG
- Phone:
- 07845 624468
- Email:
- handsgillingham@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window