Governing document CARA IRISH HOUSING ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH JULY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15TH OCTOBER 1986, 29TH OCTOBER 1987, 22ND MARCH 1993, 15TH JUNE 1998 AND 15TH OCTOBER 2001 AND 18TH JULY 2005
Charitable objects
(A) TO CARRY ON PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE IRISH COMMUNITY IN NEED OF HOUSING WITHIN THE EUROPEAN COMMUNITY MEMBER STATES, THE BUSINESS OF: (I) PROVIDING HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS: 1. IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; OR 2. WHO ARE AGED, DISABLED OR HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY), OR CHRONICALLY SICK, AND ARE IN NEED OF THE ACCOMMODATION OR OTHER BENEFITS PROVIDED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR CONDITION; OR 3. WHO ARE THEMSELVES IN NEED OF HOUSING IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY CARRY OUT CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OTHERS; OR 4. FOR WHOM IT WOULD BE CHARITABLE TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS OR OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION. (II) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE POOR, ELDERLY OR DISABLED; (III) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT URBAN REGENERATION AND IN DOING SO CO-ORDINATE THE THE PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC REGENERATION OF AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREAS IN WHICH THIS ACTIVITY IS CONDUCTED BY ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3. THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 4. THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 5. THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; 6. THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND 7. SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. (B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A COMPANY REGISTERED AS A SOCIAL LANDLORD WITH THE HOUSING CORPORATION
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.