Accounts and annual returns BRIDGWATER WOMENS AID ( REFUGE FOR BATTERED WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN )

Charity number: 290184
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 22 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 22 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 22 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 22 April 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 15 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 15 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 31 August 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 17 January 2005 On Time