BRIDGWATER WOMENS AID ( REFUGE FOR BATTERED WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
rEFUGE ACCOMMODATION FOR BATTERED WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 05 October 1984: Standard registration
- 15 October 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BRIDGWATER WOMENS AID (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.55k | £73.88k | £75.56k | £102.76k | £110.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.98k | £66.16k | £67.80k | £75.50k | £110.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 22 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 22 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 22 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 22 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 15 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 15 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 31 August 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 17 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND AMENDED 23 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING EXPERIENCED BY NEEDY WOMEN AND HAVE BEEN GRAVELY OR PERSISTENTLY MALTREATED BY MEN, WHO MAY OR MAY NOT BE THEIR HUSBANDS AND TOGETHER WITH WHOM THEY MAY OR MAY NOT BE, OR HAVE BEEN LIVING WITH, AND ANY CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window