Financial history THE INDIAN MUSLIM RELIEF COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 290198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £307 £307 £307 £920.37k £9.64k
Total expenditure £1.38k £1.38k £1.38k £2.09k £7.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £469 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £919.90k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £469 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £2.09k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.10k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £987 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A