THE INDIAN MUSLIM RELIEF COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational and religious
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- India
Governance
- 10 October 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arqam Umar Ahmad | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Omair Barkatulla | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAEED AHMAD SIDDIQUE | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABDULKADIR BARKATULLA | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|||||
RIZWAN AHMAD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307 | £307 | £307 | £920.37k | £9.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38k | £1.38k | £1.38k | £2.09k | £7.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £469 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £919.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £469 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.09k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.10k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £987 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 225 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 02 May 2021 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND AUGUST 1984
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG THE MUSLIMS OF INDIA AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PROVISION OF SHORT OR LONG TERM RELIEF TO INDIAN MUSLIM VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR MAN-MADE DISASTERS WHETHER SUCH DISASTERS OCCUR IN INDIA OR ELSEWHERE. (B) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROMOTING STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CONDITIONS AND WAYS OF LIFE AND THE HISTORY DEVELOPMENT AND SUFFERING OF INDIAN MUSLIMS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 BRENT TERRACE
LONDON
NW2 1BX
- Phone:
- 0800 3281408
- Email:
- muftibarkatullah@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window