Trustees STOWMARKET CONCERT BAND

Charity number: 290209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD CHAPMAN Chair 01 January 2008
None on record
Callan Leech-Sinclair Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Alison Jeffries Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Lucy Matthews Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Suzannah Howard-Calver Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
Graham Brown Trustee 16 July 2014
None on record
Polly Sinclair Trustee 16 July 2014
None on record
Melanie Blanchard Trustee 16 July 2014
None on record
Stephen Horrex Trustee 16 July 2014
None on record