THE WAVELL WAKEFIELD RUGBY UNION YOUTH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 1984: Standard registration
- 02 June 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 02 June 2008: Funds transferred to 1119091 MIDDLESEX SPORTS FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.44m | £244.06k | £1.37m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33m | £1.32m | £1.39m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 22 August 2007 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 22 August 2007 | 53 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 30 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 27 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 06 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 06 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARARTION OF TRUST DATED 23RD AUGUST 1984
Charitable objects
(A) THE ORGANISATION OR PRIVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF THE FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PUPILS AND STUDENTS AT SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIIES AND OTHER PLACES OF HIGHES EDUCATION IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM TO PLAY RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL OR OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS SO AS TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AND STUDENT AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS. (B) THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFAE FOR PERSONS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 21 YEARS AND WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAV ENEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window