MIDDLE BARTON PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Pre-School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 September 1984: Standard registration
- MIDDLE BARTON PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robyn Schuleman | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle van den Houten | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam van den Houten | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Yates | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Nicholls | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Bailey | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Denby | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Frost | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Harwood | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
karen McGowan | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JILL THORNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.00k | £65.10k | £91.35k | £82.87k | £95.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.00k | £65.60k | £88.39k | £102.89k | £98.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DOCUMENT ADOPTED 6TH AUGUST 1984 AS AMENDED BY MODEL CONSTITUTION ON 26 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Middle Barton Pre School
29 Church Lane
Middle Barton
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 7BX
- Phone:
- 01869 347 968
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window