DOON SCHOOL ENGLISH CHARITABLE TRUST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds from Doon School's alumni and Friends of Doon for the purposes of supporting: 1) economically disadvantaged students to study at Doon by way of bursary and scholarship programmes; and 2) important development projects (e.g. smart classrooms, housing facilities, laboratories, new buildings, etc.)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 September 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARAD RATHKE | Chair | 17 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
RAVI BULCHANDANI | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/10/2019 | 10/10/2020 | 10/10/2021 | 10/10/2022 | 10/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.38k | £700 | £2.30k | £19.50k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2019 | 20 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH SEPTEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES TO ENABLE BOYS OF ANY RELIGION, RACE OR CREED FROM ANY PART OF THE WORLD TO ATTEND THE DOON SCHOOL DEHRA DUN. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF DEED)
Area of benefit
DEHRA DUN, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 HIGHCROFT GARDENS
LONDON
NW11 0LY
- Phone:
- 02032095013
- Email:
- sharadrathke@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window