DYSLEXIA TEACHING CENTRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assessment and specialist teaching for adults and children. Maintaining a teaching and resource centre. Organising conferences and educational seminars. Liaising with local schools. Raising funds to pay for dyslexia services delivered to bursary students. Other activities in pursuance of the aims of the trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 October 1984: Standard registration
- 20 July 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 20 July 2018: Funds transferred to 1167119 THE DYSLEXIA TEACHING CENTRE
- DYSLEXIA TEACHING CENTRE (Working name)
- DYSLEXIA TEACHING CENTRE (KENSINGTON) BURSARY FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £369.83k | £422.50k | £414.22k | £399.60k | £396.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £395.53k | £458.14k | £435.43k | £448.44k | £419.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 26 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 01 June 2017 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 27 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 27 May 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 28 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | 29 May 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/08/1984 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 4TH DECEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DYSLEXIA/SPECIFIC LEARING DISABILITES PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE QUALIFIED REMEDIAL HELP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window