THE PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF TESTBOURNE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christmas Craft Fair in November. Mufti days car boot sale Refreshments for school parents evening events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 October 1984: Standard registration
- TESTBOURNE PTFA (Working name)
- TESTBOURNE SCHOOL PTFA (Working name)
- TESTBOURNE COMMUNITY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madeline Haddon | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Mason | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adele Alison Thorogood | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/09/2020 | 05/09/2021 | 05/09/2022 | 05/09/2023 | 05/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £3.79k | £7.34k | £9.67k | £8.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.09k | £14.08k | £1.76k | £23.52k | £2.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 September 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITIUTION ADOPTED 2ND DECEMBER 1983, AND AMENDED 24 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUN 2017 as amended on 10 Oct 2019 as amended on 10 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF TESTBOURNE COMMUNITY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOR NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF TESTBOURNE COMMUNITY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TESTBOURNE COMMUNITY SCHOOL
MICHELDEVER ROAD
WHITCHURCH
RG28 7JF
- Phone:
- 01256895148
- Email:
- ptfa@testbourne.school
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window