APOLLO YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public resident in Reading and the neighbourhood in the art, history and culture of people of African and Caribbean origin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
Governance
- 25 October 1984: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 July 2012: Re-registered
- 25 November 2017: Funds received from 280204 WEST INDIAN WOMEN'S CIRCLE
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phyllis Angela White | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Grandison | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Titus | Trustee | 07 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.48k | £53.08k | £61.21k | £65.69k | £71.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.99k | £46.90k | £56.08k | £64.22k | £82.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.65k | £3.54k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 March 2025 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 March 2025 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 March 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH OCTOBER 1982 AS AMENDED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1984, 26 JULY 2002 AND 14 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC RESIDENT IN READING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') IN THE ART, HISTORY AND CULTURE OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN ORIGIN. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW IN FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY. FOR FURTHER OBJECTS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
READING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 MOUNT PLEASANT
READING
BERKSHIRE
RG1 2TD
- Phone:
- 01189168416
- Email:
- apolloyouthclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window