THE PRINCE OF WALES AWARD FOR INDUSTRIAL INNOVATION AND PRODUCTION TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the Trust was established to encourage the commercialisation of technological innovation. For many years, it ran an annual competition in collaboration with BBC TV's Tomorrow's World programme. The Trust also sponsored research and conferences bringing together businesses, innovators, universities, sources of early stage finance for businesss & policy-makers. The Trust is not currently active.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 October 1984: Standard registration
- 26 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- PRINCE OF WALES INNOVATION AWARD (Working name)
- PRINCE OF WALES INNOVATION TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228 | £222 | £120 | £7 | £13 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 1984, AS AMENDED BY THE SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 21ST MAY 1996
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW AND INNOVATIVE PRODUCTS AND PROCESSES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY THE ORGANISATION OF COMPETITIONS FOR SMALL PRIZES (TO BE HELD AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE) TO BE KNOWN AS THE PRINCE OF WALES AWARD FOR INDUSTRIAL INNOVATION AND PRODUCTION THE PRINCIPAL OBJECTIVES OF SUCH COMPETITION BEING TO IDENTIFY PROMISING NEW PRODUCTS OR PROCESSES AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PRODUCTION OF MARKETING THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window