BROADLAND MERIDIAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for people who face multiple barriers to entering training and employment including: Managing a long term mental health problem; Acquiring mental health problems whilst in work; Having a learning difficulty; Having a physical disability; Are living with poor mental health; Have problems as a result of physical disability; Young people not in employment or education;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 October 1984: Standard registration
- BROADLAND MERIDIAN LIMITED (Previous name)
- MERIDIAN EAST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gavin Tempest | Chair | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Everett | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Moreen Pascal Davies | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £2.12k | £588 | £1.73k | £2.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.31k | £68.04k | £34.57k | £30.11k | £30.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/09/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PSYCHIATRIC OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF PHYSICAL OR MENTAL REHABILITATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Broadland Housing Group
NCFC
CARROW ROAD
NORWICH
NORFOLK
NR1 1HU
- Phone:
- 01603750276
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window