CREEKMOOR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the community in whichever way possible - events, information and the hiring of the Community Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 25 October 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Pedrick | Chair |
|
||||||
Cllr Judy Butt | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.05k | £15.10k | £29.31k | £30.66k | £25.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.04k | £16.60k | £25.96k | £48.31k | £20.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | £12.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH MAY 1984
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CREEKMOOR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
CREEKMOOR AREA AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 BLACKBIRD CLOSE
POOLE
BH17 7YA
- Phone:
- 07770870537
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window