THE THAME ACTIVITY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet every week sometimes we have a speaker. We do some gentle exercises. We have craft meetings and also knit, sew, crochet items which we mostly donate to charities, at home or abroad. We sell some of our work for funds to buy materials for our charity donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 October 1984: Standard registration
- 12 February 2021: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £474 | £720 | £1.02k | £1.68k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £460 | £728 | £1.12k | £1.61k | £1.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | COVID filing extension granted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | COVID filing extension granted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 03 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 01 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THAME AND ITS CLOSE ENVIRONS AND TO PROVIDE FOR THEM FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
THAME AND ITS CLOSE ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window