THE MORTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make donations to charitable causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 24 October 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Morton | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Morton FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARGARET HOWARD MORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.48k | £46.06k | £30 | £1.24k | £2.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.68k | £51.66k | £48.38k | £118.57k | £112.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
01 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT ANY ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE INSTITUTION, PURPOSE OR OBJECT OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, PURPOSES OR OBJECTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAWK HOUSE
PARK ESTATE
LA ROUTE DES GENETS
ST. BRELADE
JERSEY
JE3 8EQ
- Phone:
- 01534743726
- Email:
- alrmortonjsy@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window