Financial history THE SWANAGE PIER TRUST

Charity Number: 290397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £339.82k £557.40k £596.47k £648.40k £456.66k
Total expenditure £416.33k £380.28k £582.89k £662.02k £499.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £332.57k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £6.22k £247.31k £254.63k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £59.71k £114.26k £122.08k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £490.82k £231.77k £266.65k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £114 £504 £2.94k N/A
Income - Other N/A £535 £2.63k £2.09k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £344.35k £579.62k £264.81k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £35.92k £3.27k £11.22k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £12.76k £9.66k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £386.00k N/A