Governing document THE SWANAGE PIER TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/09/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/02/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 APR 2018 as amended on 02 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF SWANAGE IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET, OF THE PIER WITHIN THE SAID TOWN (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE PIER) AND GENERALLY TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THE PIER FOR THE SAID TOWN.
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF SWANAGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.