Trustees THE SWANAGE PIER TRUST

Charity Number: 290397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON TURNER Trustee 07 June 2024
None on record
ALISON JANE PETTITT Trustee 30 June 2023
None on record
REBECCA LOUISE MACK Trustee 03 March 2023
None on record
GARY MAURICE SUTTLE Trustee 03 December 2021
None on record
HOWARD SCOTT POTTER Trustee 05 March 2021
None on record
WILLIAM JOHN LAW Trustee 29 May 2020
None on record